Tawfiq, Afaf Kamal Abbas (CPSO#: 70653)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Maternal Fetal Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2016