Tay, Jason (CPSO#: 79877)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason Tay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 22 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Jul 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 21 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Jul 2003
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016