Taylor, Brian Vance (CPSO#: 73565)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 May 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 May 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Road to Recovery - Barrie
Unit 3
7 Anne Street South
Barrie ON  L4N 2C4
Phone: (705) 719-7333
Fax: (705) 719-0832
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Road to Recovery - Bradford
15 John St. W.
Bradford ON  L3Z 2B7
Canada
Phone: 905-775-4999
Fax: 905-775-4909
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Road to Recovery - Sault Ste. Marie
332-336 Queen St. E.
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 6K3
Canada
Phone: 705-450-7444
Fax: 705-450-6657
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian V. Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 4 2011


Corporation Name: Dr. B.V. Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Taylor ( CPSO# 73565 )

Business Address:
Road to Recovery
Unit 3
7 Anne Street South
Barrie ON  L4N 2C4
Phone Number: (705) 719-7333

Business Address:
Room 332
336 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 6K3
Phone Number: (705) 450-7444

Business Address:
15 John Street West
Bradford ON  L3Z 2B7
Phone Number: (905) 775-4999

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN VANCE TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 2002