Taylor, Bryce Ronald (CPSO#: 24231)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bryce Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Toronto General Hospital 200 Elizabeth Street Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Date Received: 24 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 08 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016