Taylor, Carolyn Vania (CPSO#: 73502)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Sep 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
1466 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3S3
Phone: (416) 531-3331
Fax: (416) 531-1639
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLYN VANIA TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 16 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 21 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2003