Taylor, Christine Melissa (CPSO#: 59831)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
333 Eglinton Ave E
Toronto ON  M4P1L7
Phone: (416) 485-4802
Fax: (416) 485-4802
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE MELISSA TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 14 Feb 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 15 Feb 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1989