Taylor, David Knight (CPSO#: 52058)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Dundee, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
15 Maki Avenue
Sudbury ON  P3E 2P3
Phone: (705) 522-2328
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 04 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID KNIGHT TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 18 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Other - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Other - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2003