Taylor, David Ronald (CPSO#: 94652)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Oct 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 17 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Columbia University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medicine
Etherington Hall, Room 1018
94 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-2780
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 22 2015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 10 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID RONALD TAYLOR may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF MEDICINE, DIVISION OF GENERAL INTERNAL MEDICINE, QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY in which Dr. TAYLOR holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. TAYLOR may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. TAYLOR no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. TAYLOR no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. TAYLOR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2016