Taylor, Elaine Mary (CPSO#: 52057)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Oct 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Oct 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5th Floor
Holland Cross, Tower B A/L3105A
1600 Scott Street
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K9
Phone: (613) 941-4774
Fax: (613) 952-9656
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELAINE MARY TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1986