Taylor, James Douglas Niven (CPSO#: 54810)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 16 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 2005