Taylor, John Robert (CPSO#: 19115)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 1559 Carletta Drive, Mississauga, ON L4X 1E2
Date Received: 12 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jan 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015