Taylor, Mark Clifford (CPSO#: 43553)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Mar 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Mar 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rm 1-033 Centennial Bldg
1276 South Park St.
Halifax NS  B3H 2Y9
Phone: 902-473-7066
Fax: 902-473-2980

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK CLIFFORD TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 24 Jun 1980 to 23 Jun 1981
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2007