Taylor, Mary May (CPSO#: 57219)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mary M. Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Taylor ( CPSO# 57219 )

Business Address:
Suite 303
1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 731-2781

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit Solutions Inc 28 Eugene St Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 Phone: 1 888 781 9083 Fax: 1 866 297 9338
Instructions: Contact above
Date Received: 24 Aug 2017

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Aug 2017