Taylor, Nathan Kirk Mackay (CPSO#: 100140)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Central Lambton Family Health Team
Unit 3
4130 Glenview Avenue
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0
Phone: (519) 882-2500
Fax: (591) 882-4321
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CEE Hospital of Bluewater Health
450 Blanche St
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0
Canada
Phone: (519) 882-1170
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

Lambton Meadowview Villa
3958 Petrolia Line
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0
Canada
Phone: (519) 882-1470
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

Fiddicks Nursing Home
437 1st Ave
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0
Canada
Phone: (519) 882-0370
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nathan Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Taylor ( CPSO# 100140)

Business Address:
Fiddick's Nursing Home
437 First Avenue
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0
Phone Number: (519) 882-0370

Business Address:
Suite 3
4130 Glenview Avenue
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0
Phone Number: (519) 882-2500

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
450 Blanche Street
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0
Phone Number: (519) 882-4325

Business Address:
Lambton Meadowview Villa
R R 4
3958 Petrolia Line
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0
Phone Number: (519) 882-1470

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATHAN KIRK MACKAY TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 27 May 2013 to 07 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2015