Taylor, Okuda Rashida (CPSO#: 93125)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 May 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3585 Lawrence Ave East
Unit 1
Scarborough ON  M1G 1P4
Phone: (416) 431-0736
Fax: (416) 431-0648
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OKUDA RASHIDA TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 26 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 2013