Taylor, Rhonda Victoria (CPSO#: 72524)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Westminster Woods Medical Centre
Unit 1
33 Farley Drive
Guelph ON  N1L 0B7
Phone: (519) 837-8137
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: (905) 813-4141
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Canada
Phone: (519) 822-5350
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rhonda V. Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Taylor ( CPSO# 72524 )

Business Address:
Westminster Woods Medical Centre
33 Farley Drive
Unit 1
Guelph ON  N1L 0B7
Phone Number: (519) 837-8137

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RHONDA VICTORIA TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2000