Taylor, Roger Michael (CPSO#: 68199)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5508
Fax: (519) 751-5550
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Taylor ( CPSO# 68199 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
Operating Room
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5508

Business Address:
1144 Wilson Street
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone Number: (905) 304-0062

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROGER MICHAEL TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1999