Taylor, Ruth Lynn (CPSO#: 78016)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
458 MacLaren Street, Ground floor
Ottawa ON  K1R 5K6
Phone: (613) 230-0029
Fax: (613) 230-9204
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Nov 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUTH LYNN TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 10 Mar 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 11 Mar 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 04 Apr 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 05 Apr 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 04 Mar 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 05 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 2007 to 30 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2008