Taylor, Sean William (CPSO#: 80918)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Neurology
Connell 7
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3263
Fax: (613) 548-1388
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sean Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Taylor ( CPSO# 80918 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Neurology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEAN WILLIAM TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2011