Taylor, Shira Grace (CPSO#: 86690)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1007A Gerrard St. E.
Toronto ON  M4M 1Z4
Phone: (416) 856-2174
Fax: (416) 856-2174
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHIRA GRACE TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2014