Taylor, Stephen Arthur (CPSO#: 33537)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen A. Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Taylor ( CPSO# 33537 )

Business Address:
4279 Hixon Road
Beamsville ON  L0R 1B0
Phone Number: (905) 563-5315

Business Address:
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Phone Number: (905) 945-2253

Medical Records Location

Address: Beamsville Medical Centre Family Health Team 4279 Huron Street Beamsville ON L0R 1B0
Date Received: 20 Dec 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2018