Taylor, Steven Joseph (CPSO#: 58451)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1988

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1187 Fischer Hallman Road
Kitchener ON  N2E 4H9
Phone: (519) 570-1200
Fax: (519) 570-1214
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. J. Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Taylor ( CPSO# 58451 )

Business Address:
1187 Fischer Hallman Road
Kitchener ON  N2E 4H9
Phone Number: (519) 570-1200

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN JOSEPH TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1988

Concerns

Source: Legal Department
Active Date: May 22, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Charges:

Effective May 29, 2015, where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.

The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

It is alleged that Steven Taylor:

on or about May 22, 2017 at the City of Kitchener did commit an assault on XX contrary to Section 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada, and

on or about May 22, 2017 at the City of Kitchener, did in committing an assault upon XX use a weapon to wit: a glass contrary to Section 267(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of charges: May 25, 2017
Place of charges: Kitchener, ON
Waterloo Regional Police Service