Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Taylor, Vicki Lynn (CPSO#: 57382)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 20 Nov 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 16 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Nov 1991