Taylor, Wanda Bowman (CPSO#: 59618)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Mar 2017