Taylor, William Harold (CPSO#: 19716)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 48 Beveridge Drive, Toronto, ON M3A 2B3 Telephone: 416-444-9081
Date Received: 21 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015