Taylor, William James (CPSO#: 52944)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital-Ouellette
Department Of Anaesthesia
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4421
Fax: (519) 255-2130
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Taylor ( CPSO# 52944 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4421

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 08 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM JAMES TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1984