Taylor, William Paxton (CPSO#: 33087)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Apr 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 1995