Taylor-Wall, Suzanne Eva Maria (CPSO#: 88374)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: Taylor, Suzanne Eva Maria (used until: 03 Apr 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
1261 Beaverbrook Avenue
London ON  N6H 0G6
Phone: (519) 642-2077
Fax: (519) 642-1725
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Taylor-Wall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Taylor-Wall ( CPSO# 88374 )

Business Address:
Unit 1
1261 Beaverbrook Avenue
London ON  N6H 0G6
Phone Number: (519) 642-2077

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUZANNE EVA MARIA TAYLOR-WALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR-WALL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011