Taynen, Howard Douglas (CPSO#: 32458)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Jun 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
514 Wilson Street East
Ancaster ON  L9G 2C5
Phone: (905) 648-7227
Fax: 905-648-6930
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Taynen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Taynen ( CPSO# 32458 )

Business Address:
514 Wilson Street East
Ancaster ON  L9G 2C5
Phone Number: (905) 648-7227

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2008
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 31 Jul 2008

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2008 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., June 24, 2008, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
            and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr.
            Howard Douglas Taynen:

                  (a)   Dr. Taynen shall not accept for treatment patients who have been
                        identified as or diagnosed with Borderline Personality Disorder.
                        If Dr. Taynen learns after commencing treatment with a patient that
                        he or she has Borderline Personality Disorder he shall immediately
                        cease treatment of the patient and shall refer such patient to
                        another psychiatrist; and 
                  
                  (b)   Within 30 days of the date of this Order, Dr. Taynen will contact
                        the College for the purpose of setting up a comprehensive practice
                        assessment, which assessment he shall undergo at his own expense,
                        and he will cooperate fully with the practice assessment and will
                        abide by any recommendations flowing therefrom.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Jun 2008
Summary:

On June 24, 2008, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario found that Dr. Howard Douglas Taynen committed acts of professional misconduct in 
that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.  The Discipline Committee 
ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    Dr. Taynen appear before the panel to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to 
      be recorded on the register.  
 
2.    The Registrar suspend Dr. Taynen's certificate of registration for a period of one month, 
      to commence on July 1, 2008. 
 
3.    The Registrar suspend Dr. Taynen's certificate of registration for an additional period of 
      one month, to commence February 1, 2009, all of which will be suspended if Dr. Taynen 
      attends the following courses and provides proof thereof to the College prior to January 
      12, 2009: 
 
      (a)   The College course "Understanding Boundary Issues and Managing the Risks 
            Inherent in the Doctor-Patient Relationship"; 
      (b)   A College-approved ethics course; and 
      (c)   Part A of the course offered by the Centre for Addiction and Mental Health and 
            run by members of the Borderline Personality Disorder Clinic entitled "Dialectical 
            Behaviour Therapy".  
 
4.    The following terms, conditions and limitations be imposed on Dr. Taynen's certificate of 
      registration: 
 
      (a)   Dr. Taynen shall not accept for treatment patients who have been identified as or 
            diagnosed with Borderline Personality Disorder.  If Dr. Taynen learns after 
            commencing treatment with a patient that he or she has Borderline Personality 
            Disorder he shall immediately cease treatment of the patient and shall refer such 
            patient to another psychiatrist; and 
      (b)   Within 30 days of the date of this Order, Dr. Taynen will contact the College for 
            the purpose of setting up a comprehensive practice assessment, which assessment 
            he shall undergo at his own expense, and he will co-operate fully with the practice 
            assessment and will abide by any recommendations flowing therefrom. 
 
5.    Dr. Taynen pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650.00 within 60 days of the date 
      of this Order. 
 
6.    The results of this proceeding to be included in the register. 
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 24, 2008