Tayyeb, Tahir (CPSO#: 81838)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Nishtar Medical College, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 22 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Aug 2004 to 17 Oct 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 18 Oct 2004 to 19 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 20 Aug 2005 to 19 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 20 Aug 2006 to 19 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 20 Aug 2007 to 19 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 20 Aug 2008 to 19 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 20 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2010