Tazzeo, James Isaiah (CPSO#: 67783)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 115
210 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 7V1
Phone: (705) 329-1223
Fax: (844) 321-8485
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES ISAIAH TAZZEO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAZZEO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996