Teague, Kevin Richard (CPSO#: 78430)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie, Ontario
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728 9090
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin R. Teague Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Teague ( CPSO# 78430 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9802

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN RICHARD TEAGUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEAGUE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Aug 2002 to 11 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007