Teague, Paul Edward Robert (CPSO#: 19937)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1966

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1966

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
pelham group after hours clinic
St Catharines ON  L2S 1X8
Phone: (905) 988-1933
Fax: (905) 988-5918
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL EDWARD ROBERT TEAGUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEAGUE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Oct 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1973