Teal, Patricia Kathleen (CPSO#: 23175)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Oct 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Oct 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Douglas Memorial Hospital
Medical Centre
238 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z3
Phone: (905) 871-6737
Fax: (905) 871-9893
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Teal and Dr. Henry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 14 2006


Corporation Name: Dr. Teal and Dr. Henry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Teal ( CPSO# 23175 )
Dr. D. Henry ( CPSO# 22752 )

Business Address:
Douglas Memorial Hospital
Medical Centre
238 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z3
Phone Number: (905) 871-6737

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 07 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA KATHLEEN TEAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1970