Tebbenham, Troy Edward (CPSO#: 69937)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: 7058765022
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tebbenham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tebbenham ( CPSO# 69937 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9L 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TROY EDWARD TEBBENHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEBBENHAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 15 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001