Tebbutt, Lewis Christopher (CPSO#: 59601)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone: (705) 725-9699
Fax: (705) 733-8350
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Christopher Tebbutt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Tebbutt ( CPSO# 59601 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9802

Business Address:
300 - 125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone Number: (905) 725-9699

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEWIS CHRISTOPHER TEBBUTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEBBUTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1989