Tecimer, Sandy Nebihe (CPSO#: 80751)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Prince Edward Medical
Unit 2
324 Prince Edward Drive South
Toronto ON  M8Y 3Z5
Phone: (647) 345-3048
Fax: (647) 345-3058
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Sandy Tecimer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tecimer ( CPSO# 80751 )

Business Address:
Prince Edward Medical
324 Prince Edward Drive South
Unit 2
Toronto ON  M8Y 3Z5
Phone Number: (647) 345-3048

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDY NEBIHE TECIMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TECIMER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2006