Tedder, Alison Tessa Clare (CPSO#: 102027)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English, Zulu

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville hospital
Church st
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 9054727074
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

South Africa
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 08 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALISON TESSA CLARE TEDDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEDDER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2013 to 18 Oct 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2016