Teel, Warren David (CPSO#: 62153)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Occupational Health Clinic
171 Kendall Street
Point Edward ON  N7V 4G6
Phone: (519) 337-4627
Fax: (519) 337-9442
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Warren Teel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Teel ( CPSO# 62153 )

Business Address:
Occupational Health Clinic
171 Kendall Street
Point Edward ON  N7V 4G6
Phone Number: (519) 337-4627

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WARREN DAVID TEEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1991