Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Teh, Moong Chuan (CPSO#: 60416)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Nov 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Nov 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Alberta, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit C12
8380 Kennedy Road
Markham ON  L3R 0W4
Phone: (905) 946-0882
Fax: (905) 946-0436
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Teh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Teh ( CPSO# 60416 )

Business Address:
Unit C12
8380 Kennedy Road
Markham ON  L3R 0W4
Phone Number: (905) 946-0882

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOONG CHUAN TEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 1988