Teitel, Jerome Mark (CPSO#: 26627)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5128
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.M. Teitel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Teitel ( CPSO# 26627 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Suite 2-080 Donnelly Wing
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5128

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 20 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEROME MARK TEITEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEITEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1981