Teitelbaum, Louise Ellen (CPSO#: 57303)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Montreal, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Continuing Care Centre
- Mental Health Services
752 King Street West
Postal Bag 603
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone: 613 544-4900 Ext. 53503
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Louise Teitelbaum Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Teitelbaum ( CPSO# 57303 )

Business Address:
Providence Continuing Care Centre
Postal Bag 603
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUISE ELLEN TEITELBAUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEITELBAUM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1987