Teixeira, Otto Hugo Prisco (CPSO#: 28952)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Apr 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:University of Bahia, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Paediatric Cardiology Effective: 29 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Apr 2007