Tejeda Rosario, Juan Ernesto (CPSO#: 42300)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Mar 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Mar 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Santo Domingo, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 Mar 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Feb 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1994
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2007
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 11 Jan 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Mar 2007

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: March 14, 2007
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Juan Ernesto Tejeda to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the "College"). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College's Registration Department): 1. I, DR. JUAN ERNESTO TEJEDA ROSARIO, hereby resign from the College effective immediately. 2. I hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 4. I acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the College agrees to withdraw the referral to the Discipline Committee, as alleged in the Notice of Hearing dated December 7, 2006, for sexual abuse, sexual impropriety, and disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct regarding two patients, in which it is alleged that I engaged in oral sex, anal sex and masturbation with each patient, and many of the sexual acts are alleged to have occurred in my office. 5. I do not admit to any of the allegations contained in the Notice of Hearing. 6. I agree that, in the event I have attempted to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding for breach of this undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to proceed with the prosecution of the allegations contained in the Notice of Hearing dated December 7, 2006.