Tejpar, Shamim (CPSO#: 59193)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Kachchi

Education:Pahlavi University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kara & Tejpar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 30 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 128 O'Loane Avenue Stratford ON N5A 6S4
Date Received: 25 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 21 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017