Teku, Edo (CPSO#: 62331)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Amharic, English

Education:University of Palacky, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 511
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone: (416) 539-8181
Fax: (416) 539-8797
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDO TEKU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEKU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1991