Telang, Harshad (CPSO#: 65113)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone: (807) 345-4500
Fax: (807) 345-4501
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Biman & Telang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Biman ( CPSO# 65068 )
Dr. H. Telang ( CPSO# 65113 )

Business Address:
303 - 984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone Number: (807) 345-4500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARSHAD TELANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TELANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993