Tellier, Raymond (CPSO#: 61238)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Provincial Laboratory Public Hlth
Calgary Site
3030 Hospital Drive North West
Calgary AB  T2N 4W4
Phone: (403) 944-2724
Fax: (403) 283-0142

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAYMOND TELLIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TELLIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1991