Telner, Adam Henry (CPSO#: 29077)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 May 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 May 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LMC Endocrinology Centres
Suite 107
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Phone: (416) 645-2929
Fax: (416) 645-2930
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adam Telner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Telner ( CPSO# 29077 )

Business Address:
LMC Endocrinology Centres
107 - 1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Phone Number: (416) 645-2929

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM HENRY TELNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TELNER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1977