Temple, Bryan Kerry (CPSO#: 51937)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Oct 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
89 Queensway West
Suite 110
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 566-9330
Fax: (905) 566-5683
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B Temple Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Temple ( CPSO# 51937 )

Business Address:
110 - 89 The Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 566-9330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRYAN KERRY TEMPLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEMPLE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1987